ID H0020 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 28, 2017 Session Law Chapter 43 Effective: 02/28/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 28, 2017 Session Law Chapter 43 Effective: 02/28/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
VEHICLES -- Amends existing law to provide for plug-in hybrid vehicle fees, to provide an exception regarding fees for electric vehicles, to revise fee provisions regarding certain hybrid vehicles; and to provide for the apportionment of fees.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for plug-in hybrid vehicle fees, to provide an exception regarding fees for electric vehicles, to revise fee provisions regarding certain hybrid vehicles; and to provide for the apportionment of fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 28, 2017 Session Law Chapter 43 Effective: 02/28/2017 |
2017-02-24 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:10 a.m. on February 23, 2017 |
2017-02-23 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-02-21 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-02-20 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-02-17 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 30-2-3 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-02-07 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-07 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-07 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0 |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |