ID H0012 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 2, 2015 Session Law Chapter 20 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 2, 2015 Session Law Chapter 20 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SALES TAX - Amends existing law to provide that certain sales of utility type vehicles and specialty off-highway vehicles to nonresidents are exempt from sales tax if certain conditions are met.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that certain sales of utility type vehicles and specialty off-highway vehicles to nonresidents are exempt from sales tax if certain conditions are met.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 2, 2015 Session Law Chapter 20 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on February 24, 2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2015-02-19 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2015-02-18 | Senate | to House |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-02-18 | Senate | PASSED -- 33-0-1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-01-30 | House | to Senate |
2015-01-30 | House | Title apvd |
2015-01-30 | House | PASSED -- 66-1-3 |
2015-01-30 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-01-29 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-01-28 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2015-01-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |