ID H0007 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-15 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 2 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-15 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 2 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the taxation of cigarettes and tobacco products by adding the definition "delivery seller" to the definition of "wholesaler" and clarifying whether tobacco cessation products should be taxed as tobacco products.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the taxation of cigarettes and tobacco products by adding the definition "delivery seller" to the definition of "wholesaler" and clarifying whether tobacco cessation products should be taxed as tobacco products.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 2 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-02-15 | Delivered to Governor on 02/14 | |
2011-02-14 | To Governor | |
2011-02-11 | Pres signed | |
2011-02-10 | Sp signed | |
2011-02-10 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-02-09 | To enrol | |
2011-02-08 | to House | |
2011-02-08 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-08 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-02-04 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-04 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-03 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-03 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-03 | Rpt out | |
2011-01-25 | to Loc Gov | |
2011-01-25 | 1st rdg | |
2011-01-25 | Senate intro | |
2011-01-24 | to Senate | |
2011-01-24 | Title apvd | |
2011-01-24 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 65-2-3 | |
2011-01-21 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-01-21 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-01-20 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-01-20 | rec d/p | |
2011-01-20 | Rpt out | |
2011-01-18 | to Rev/Tax | |
2011-01-18 | Rpt prt | |
2011-01-17 | to printing | |
2011-01-17 | 1st rdg | |
2011-01-17 | House intro |