IA SSB3180 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF2388

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2388.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act limiting local legislation that prohibits the operation of an animal enterprise or the use of a working animal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act limiting local legislation that prohibits the operation of an animal enterprise or the use of a working animal.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2388.
2020-02-18SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2020-02-17SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2020 10:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
2020-02-13SenateSubcommittee: Kapucian, Kinney, and Zumbach.
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced, referred to Agriculture.
2020-02-13SenateBy COMMITTEE ON AGRICULTURE

Same As/Similar To

SF2388 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 397.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback