IA SSB3177 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2327.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2327.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of certain moneys in the storage tank management account of the groundwater protection fund, and making appropriations.(See SF 2327, SF 2414.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of certain moneys in the storage tank management account of the groundwater protection fund, and making appropriations.(See SF 2327, SF 2414.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2327. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sweeney, Bennett, Celsi, Cournoyer, De Witt, Driscoll, Evans, Green, Knox, Rozenboom, Shipley, Trone Garriott, and Zumbach. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON NATURAL RESOURCES AND ENVIRONMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB699 (Related) 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2588.
SF2327 (Replaced by) 2024-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2414. S.J. 613.
HF2588 (Replaced by) 2024-04-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 757.
HF2646 (Replaced by) 2024-04-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 757.
SF2414 (Replaced by) 2024-05-09 - NOBA: Final
SF2327 (Replaced by) 2024-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2414. S.J. 613.
HF2588 (Replaced by) 2024-04-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 757.
HF2646 (Replaced by) 2024-04-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 757.
SF2414 (Replaced by) 2024-05-09 - NOBA: Final
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3177 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3177.html |