IA SSB3156 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2542
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2367
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2367
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2367.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2367.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to education, including modifying provisions related to education data collection and the determination of enrollment, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 2367.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to education, including modifying provisions related to education data collection and the determination of enrollment, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 2367.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2367. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2024 4:00PM Room 315. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Gruenhagen, and Trone Garriott. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB672 (Related) 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2542.
HF2542 (Replaced by) 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 587.
SF2367 (Replaced by) 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
HF2542 (Replaced by) 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 587.
SF2367 (Replaced by) 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3156 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3156.html |