IA SSB3151 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2259
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - Voted - Human Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - Voted - Human Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act concerning treatment of a person with a serious mental impairment who fails to comply with an outpatient treatment order.
Title
A study bill for an act concerning treatment of a person with a serious mental impairment who fails to comply with an outpatient treatment order.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | Senate | Voted - Human Resources. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | 2:30PM; Room 206 Human Resources. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Human Resources: Mathis Chair,Allen, and Chelgren. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | In Human Resources |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SF2259 (Replaced by) 2016-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 761.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB3151 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB3151.html |