IA SSB3146 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Voted - Economic Growth.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Voted - Economic Growth.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act modifying the state sales tax rebate to the owner or operator of a baseball and softball tournament facility and movie site.
Title
A study bill for an act modifying the state sales tax rebate to the owner or operator of a baseball and softball tournament facility and movie site.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | Senate | Voted - Economic Growth. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | 1:30PM; RM 206 Economic Growth. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Economic Growth: Dotzler Chair,Guth, and Mathis. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | In Economic Growth |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SF2212 (Replaced by) 2016-04-12 - Returned to committee.
HSB655 (Related) 2016-04-19 - Voted - Ways and Means.
SF2312 (Replaced by) 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
HF2463 (Replaced by) 2016-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 746.
HSB655 (Related) 2016-04-19 - Voted - Ways and Means.
SF2312 (Replaced by) 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
HF2463 (Replaced by) 2016-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 746.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB3146 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB3146.html |