IA SF2312 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying the state sales tax rebate to the owner or operator of a baseball and softball tournament facility and movie site. (Formerly SSB 3146 and SF 2212.)
Title
A bill for an act modifying the state sales tax rebate to the owner or operator of a baseball and softball tournament facility and movie site. (Formerly SSB 3146 and SF 2212.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Failed to pass Senate (Y: 22 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Failed to pass Senate (Y: 22 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 783. |
2016-04-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 746. |
2016-04-25 | House | Passed House, ayes 78, nays 18. H.J. 738. |
2016-04-25 | House | Substituted for HF 2463. H.J. 737. |
2016-04-21 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2016-04-21 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 715. |
2016-04-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 699. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 751. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 28, nays 22. S.J. 750. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-5151 filed, adopted. S.J. 750. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote prevailed, ayes 32, nayes 18. S.J. 749. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Motions filed to reconsider vote on bill. S.J. 723. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Failed to pass Senate, ayes 22, nays 28. S.J. 718. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5129 adopted. S.J. 717. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Amendment S-5129 filed. S.J. 708. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 691. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 690. |