IA SSB3145 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF2242
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2408

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act regulating the sale of eggs by grocery stores participating in federal programs, and providing for penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act regulating the sale of eggs by grocery stores participating in federal programs, and providing for penalties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-07SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2018-02-06SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2018 11:00AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
2018-02-06SenateSubcommittee: Zumbach, Brown, and Bowman.
2018-02-06SenateBy COMMITTEE ON AGRICULTURE

Same As/Similar To

SF2242 (Replaced by) 2018-03-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 523.
HF2408 (Replaced by) 2018-03-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 653.
HSB623 (Related) 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback