IA HF2408 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 653.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act regulating the sale of eggs by grocery stores participating in a federal program. (Formerly HSB 623.) Effective 7-1-18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act regulating the sale of eggs by grocery stores participating in a federal program. (Formerly HSB 623.) Effective 7-1-18.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 653.
2018-03-21HouseSent to Governor. H.J. 652.
2018-03-21HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 652.
2018-03-05HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 459.
2018-03-05SenateImmediate message. S.J. 526.
2018-03-05SenatePassed Senate, ayes 32, nays 17. S.J. 522.
2018-03-05SenateSubstituted for SF 2242. S.J. 521.
2018-02-27SenateRead first time and attached to similar SF 2242. S.J. 448.
2018-02-27SenateMessage from House. S.J. 448.
2018-02-26HouseImmediate message. H.J. 392.
2018-02-26HousePassed House, ayes 81 nays 17. H.J. 388.
2018-02-26HouseAmendment H-8083 lost. H.J. 387.
2018-02-22HouseAmendment H-8083 filed. H.J. 372.
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 297.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback