IA SSB3143 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2260
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2411
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2411
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2260.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2260.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to work-based learning, including by repealing provisions related to regional industry sector partnerships and the statewide work-based learning intermediary network, establishing the workforce opportunity fund within the department of workforce development, modifying provisions related to career and technical education, student teacher requirements for students with substitute teaching or para-educator experience, and the future ready Iowa skilled workforce last-dollar scholarship program, and making appropriations.(See SF 2260, SF 2411.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to work-based learning, including by repealing provisions related to regional industry sector partnerships and the statewide work-based learning intermediary network, establishing the workforce opportunity fund within the department of workforce development, modifying provisions related to career and technical education, student teacher requirements for students with substitute teaching or para-educator experience, and the future ready Iowa skilled workforce last-dollar scholarship program, and making appropriations.(See SF 2260, SF 2411.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2260. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2024 2:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee: Gruenhagen, Donahue, and Taylor, J. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Workforce. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON WORKFORCE |
Same As/Similar To
SF2260 (Replaced by) 2024-03-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2411. S.J. 607.
SF2411 (Replaced by) 2024-05-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 963.
SF2411 (Replaced by) 2024-05-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 963.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3143 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3143.html |