IA SSB3134 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2361
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2361.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2361.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the names of reorganized mutual insurance companies.(See SF 2361.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the names of reorganized mutual insurance companies.(See SF 2361.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2361. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2024 8:30AM Senate Lounge. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee: Rowley, Schultz, and Trone Garriott. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SF2361 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 809.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3134 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3134.html |