IA SSB3133 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SJR2006
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the gubernatorial line of succession.
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the gubernatorial line of succession.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2018 3:00PM RM 319.4 (Crow's Nest) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee: Smith, Brown, and Bisignano. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SJR2006 (Replaced by) 2018-05-02 - Sent to Secretary of State. S.J. 1042.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3133 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3133.html |