IA SSB3133 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HJR2006
Note: Legislation replaced by SJR2006
Note: Legislation replaced by SJR2006
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - Voted - Education.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - Voted - Education.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for a Joint Resolution nullifying an administrative rule by the board of educational examiners establishing a special education endorsement and specializations and including effective date provisions.
Title
A study bill for a Joint Resolution nullifying an administrative rule by the board of educational examiners establishing a special education endorsement and specializations and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | Senate | Voted - Education. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | 9:00AM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Education. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Education: Schoenjahn Chair,Quirmbach, and Sinclair. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | In Education |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HJR2006 (Replaced by) 2016-03-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 563.
SJR2006 (Replaced by) 2016-04-13 - Sent to Secretary of State. S.J. 691.
SJR2006 (Replaced by) 2016-04-13 - Sent to Secretary of State. S.J. 691.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB3133 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB3133.html |