IA SSB3125 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2126
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2299
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2299
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to stroke-related care including the designation of comprehensive and primary stroke centers and acute stroke-ready hospitals, and stroke transport protocols.
Title
A bill for an act relating to stroke-related care including the designation of comprehensive and primary stroke centers and acute stroke-ready hospitals, and stroke transport protocols.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2018 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee: Segebart, Greene, and Ragan. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HF2126 (Replaced by) 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF2299 (Replaced by) 2018-03-22 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671.
SF2299 (Replaced by) 2018-03-22 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3125 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3125.html |