IA SF2299 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to stroke-related care including the designation of comprehensive, primary, and thrombectomy-capable stroke centers and acute stroke-ready hospitals. (Formerly SSB 3125.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to stroke-related care including the designation of comprehensive, primary, and thrombectomy-capable stroke centers and acute stroke-ready hospitals. (Formerly SSB 3125.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671. |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 590. |
2018-03-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-03-07 | House | Subcommittee: Koester, Brown-Powers and Jacobsen. H.J. 515. |
2018-03-02 | House | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 445. |
2018-03-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 445. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 509. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 508. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Amendment S-5079 filed, adopted. S.J. 508. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 334. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 329. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2126 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SSB3125 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SSB3125 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.