IA SSB3120 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2280
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2280.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2280.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain deadlines relating to the informal review and protest of property assessments in counties declared to be a disaster area.(See SF 2280.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain deadlines relating to the informal review and protest of property assessments in counties declared to be a disaster area.(See SF 2280.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2280. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2022 8:30AM Room 24. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee: Lofgren, Guth, and Hogg. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Local Government. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF2280 (Replaced by) 2022-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3120 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3120.html |