IA SSB3120 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2277
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2216
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2216
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Voted - Commerce.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Voted - Commerce.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to utility facilities of electric transmission owners within public road rights=of=way.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to utility facilities of electric transmission owners within public road rights=of=way.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | Senate | Voted - Commerce. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | 11:30AM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Commerce. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Commerce: Allen Chair,Anderson, and McCoy. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | In Commerce |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HSB506 (Related) 2016-02-04 - Voted - Commerce.
HF2277 (Replaced by) 2016-03-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 457.
SF2216 (Replaced by) 2016-02-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 365.
HF2277 (Replaced by) 2016-03-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 457.
SF2216 (Replaced by) 2016-02-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 365.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB3120 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB3120.html |