IA SSB3118 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2263
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2481
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2481
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2263.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2263.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the validity of certificates of the treasurer.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the validity of certificates of the treasurer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2263. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2020 3:30PM RM 315. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee: Guth, Segebart, and Smith, J. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB677 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 311.
SF2263 (Replaced by) 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 731.
HF2481 (Replaced by) 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
SF2263 (Replaced by) 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 731.
HF2481 (Replaced by) 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3118 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3118.html |