IA SF2263 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 731.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 731.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the validity of certificates of the treasurer. (Formerly SSB 3118.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the validity of certificates of the treasurer. (Formerly SSB 3118.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 731. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | HF 2481 substituted. S.J. 730. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 2481. S.J. 527. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 310. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 303. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3118 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2263.
HSB677 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 311.
HF2481 (Similar To) 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
HSB677 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 311.
HF2481 (Similar To) 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2263 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2263.html |