IA SSB3114 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2258
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - Voted - Human Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - Voted - Human Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act concerning child welfare, including provisions relating to children under the custody, control, and supervision of the department of human services and provisions relating to children who are sex trafficking victims.
Title
A study bill for an act concerning child welfare, including provisions relating to children under the custody, control, and supervision of the department of human services and provisions relating to children who are sex trafficking victims.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | Senate | Voted - Human Resources. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | 8:30AM; Law Library Conference Room Human Resources. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Human Resources: Mathis Chair,Ragan, and Segebart. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | In Human Resources |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HSB608 (Related) 2016-02-16 - 8:00AM; House Lounge Human Resources.
SF2258 (Replaced by) 2016-04-06 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 650.
SF2258 (Replaced by) 2016-04-06 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 650.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB3114 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB3114.html |