IA SSB3100 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2308
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2308.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2308.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa patriots memorial highway, and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa patriots memorial highway, and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2308. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 1:30PM RM G17. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Dotzler, and Koelker. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON VETERANS AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
SF2308 (Replaced by) 2020-03-11 - Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 587.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3100 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3100.html |