IA SSB3087 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2331
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2281
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2281
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act concerning investment of certain public funds in and public contracts with companies that boycott Israel.
Title
A study bill for an act concerning investment of certain public funds in and public contracts with companies that boycott Israel.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Voted - State Government. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | 2:00PM; Room 206 State Government. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | State Government: Danielson Chair,Horn, and Johnson. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | In State Government |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HSB583 (Related) 2016-02-11 - Voted - State Government.
HF2331 (Replaced by) 2016-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 999.
SF2281 (Replaced by) 2016-04-27 - Withdrawn. S.J. 803.
HF2331 (Replaced by) 2016-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 999.
SF2281 (Replaced by) 2016-04-27 - Withdrawn. S.J. 803.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB3087 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB3087.html |