IA SF2281 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Withdrawn. S.J. 803.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Withdrawn. S.J. 803.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning investment of certain public funds in and public contracts with companies that boycott Israel. (Formerly SSB 3087.)
Title
A bill for an act concerning investment of certain public funds in and public contracts with companies that boycott Israel. (Formerly SSB 3087.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 803. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | HF 2331 substituted. S.J. 802. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 433. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 314. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 307. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SF2281 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/86thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2281.html |