IA SSB3083 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2189.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the national guard of the state concerning armory board leases, persons subject to the code of military justice, and scholarship and loan repayment programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the national guard of the state concerning armory board leases, persons subject to the code of military justice, and scholarship and loan repayment programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2189.
2020-01-30SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/04/2020 11:30AM RM 315.
2020-01-28SenateSubcommittee: Miller-Meeks, Giddens, and Johnson.
2020-01-28SenateIntroduced, referred to State Government.
2020-01-28SenateBy COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

HSB626 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 299.
SF2189 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 244.
HF2496 (Replaced by) 2020-03-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 568.
HF2617 (Replaced by) 2020-03-11 - Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 571.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback