IA HSB626 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 299.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 299.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the national guard of the state concerning armory board leases, persons subject to the code of military justice, and scholarship and loan repayment programs.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the national guard of the state concerning armory board leases, persons subject to the code of military justice, and scholarship and loan repayment programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 299. |
2020-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2020 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee: Salmon, Kerr and Kurtz. H.J. 190. |
2020-02-04 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3083 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2189.
SF2189 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 244.
HF2496 (Replaced by) 2020-03-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 568.
HF2617 (Replaced by) 2020-03-11 - Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 571.
SF2189 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 244.
HF2496 (Replaced by) 2020-03-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 568.
HF2617 (Replaced by) 2020-03-11 - Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 571.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB626 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB626.html |