IA SSB3063 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2367
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2583
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2583
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2367.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2367.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to sales, use, and motor vehicle fuel taxes administered by the department of revenue including distributions to local governments and school districts, the liability of sellers, tax refund and tax credit incentives, and motor fuel tax reporting and terminology modifications, and providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 2367.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to sales, use, and motor vehicle fuel taxes administered by the department of revenue including distributions to local governments and school districts, the liability of sellers, tax refund and tax credit incentives, and motor fuel tax reporting and terminology modifications, and providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 2367.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2367. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2022 8:30AM Room G17. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Bolkcom, and Goodwin. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
HSB552 (Related) 2022-04-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2583.
SF2367 (Replaced by) 2022-06-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 942.
HF2583 (Replaced by) 2022-05-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 892.
SF2367 (Replaced by) 2022-06-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 942.
HF2583 (Replaced by) 2022-05-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 892.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3063 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3063.html |