IA HSB552 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2367
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2583
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2583
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2583.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2583.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to sales, use, and motor vehicle fuel taxes administered by the department of revenue including distributions to local governments and school districts, the liability of sellers, tax refund and tax credit incentives, and motor fuel tax reporting and terminology modifications, and providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See HF 2583.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to sales, use, and motor vehicle fuel taxes administered by the department of revenue including distributions to local governments and school districts, the liability of sellers, tax refund and tax credit incentives, and motor fuel tax reporting and terminology modifications, and providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See HF 2583.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2583. |
2022-03-30 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 751. |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/03/2022 2:30PM House Lounge. |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Bloomingdale and Winckler. H.J. 96. |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 91. |
2022-01-19 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3063 (Related) 2022-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2367.
SF2367 (Replaced by) 2022-06-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 942.
HF2583 (Replaced by) 2022-05-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 892.
SF2367 (Replaced by) 2022-06-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 942.
HF2583 (Replaced by) 2022-05-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 892.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB552 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB552.html |