IA SSB3063 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2020 8:30AM RM 315.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2020 8:30AM RM 315.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to self-service storage insurance, and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to self-service storage insurance, and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2020 8:30AM RM 315. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 3:30PM RM 315. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Bolkcom, and Johnson. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB592 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3063 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3063.html |