IA SSB3052 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2201
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2319
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2319
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-29 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-29 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the national guard, by authorizing a morale, welfare, and recreation activity and establishing procedures concerning notification of civilian authorities regarding certain criminal offenses committed by members of the national guard.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the national guard, by authorizing a morale, welfare, and recreation activity and establishing procedures concerning notification of civilian authorities regarding certain criminal offenses committed by members of the national guard.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2018 11:00AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Lofgren, Edler, and Ragan. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON VETERANS AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
SF2201 (Replaced by) 2018-03-28 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 812.
HF2319 (Replaced by) 2018-03-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 512.
HSB587 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2319 (Replaced by) 2018-03-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 512.
HSB587 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3052 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3052.html |