IA SSB3046 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2188
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2188.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2188.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the reporting requirements of community colleges in connection with moneys deposited in the community colleges' workforce training and economic development funds.(See SF 2188.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the reporting requirements of community colleges in connection with moneys deposited in the community colleges' workforce training and economic development funds.(See SF 2188.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2188. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2024 4:00PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Taylor, J., Celsi, and Garrett. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB565 (Related) 2024-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 3-0.
SF2188 (Replaced by) 2024-02-01 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 202.
SF2188 (Replaced by) 2024-02-01 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 202.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3046 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3046.html |