IA SSB3045 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2192
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2192.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2192.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the state board of education's duties in connection with the core curriculum.(See SF 2192.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the state board of education's duties in connection with the core curriculum.(See SF 2192.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2192. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2024 11:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Green, Quirmbach, and Westrich. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB571 (Related) 2024-01-23 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 135.
SF2192 (Replaced by) 2024-02-01 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 203.
SF2192 (Replaced by) 2024-02-01 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 203.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3045 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3045.html |