IA SSB3040 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2274
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2571
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2571
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2274.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2274.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to a death affecting the public interest and reporting requirements of county medical examiners.
Title
A bill for an act relating to a death affecting the public interest and reporting requirements of county medical examiners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2274. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2020 8:30AM RM 315. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2020 10:30AM RM 315. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Kinney, and Sweeney. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB610 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 312.
SF2274 (Replaced by) 2020-02-17 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 324.
HF2571 (Replaced by) 2020-02-26 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 382.
SF2274 (Replaced by) 2020-02-17 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 324.
HF2571 (Replaced by) 2020-02-26 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 382.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3040 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3040.html |