IA HF2571 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 382.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 382.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating a work group to study information shared between county medical examiners and the Iowa division of criminal investigation criminalistics laboratory. (Formerly HSB 610.)
Title
A bill for an act creating a work group to study information shared between county medical examiners and the Iowa division of criminal investigation criminalistics laboratory. (Formerly HSB 610.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 382. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3040 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2274.
HSB610 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 312.
SF2274 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 324.
HSB610 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 312.
SF2274 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 324.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2571 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2571.html |