IA SSB3039 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2231
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to disaster aid payment authorization requirements under specified circumstances.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to disaster aid payment authorization requirements under specified circumstances.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | Senate | Voted - State Government. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | 10:45AM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge State Government. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | State Government: Dvorsky Chair,Schoenjahn, and Schultz. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | In State Government |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SF2231 (Replaced by) 2016-03-30 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 611.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB3039 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB3039.html |