IA SSB3037 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2187
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2276
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2276
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2187.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2187.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the application and construction of the uniform protected series Act.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the application and construction of the uniform protected series Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2187. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 12:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Hogg, and Sinclair. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB538 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 210.
SF2187 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 615.
HF2276 (Replaced by) 2020-03-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 442.
SF2187 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 615.
HF2276 (Replaced by) 2020-03-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 442.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3037 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3037.html |