IA SSB3034 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2187
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2144
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2144
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-29 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2144.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-29 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2144.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain reporting requirements of the department of transportation.(See SF 2144.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain reporting requirements of the department of transportation.(See SF 2144.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2144. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2024 12:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dickey, Brown, and Winckler. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB518 (Related) 2024-01-29 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2187.
HF2187 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
SF2144 (Replaced by) 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 569.
HF2187 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
SF2144 (Replaced by) 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 569.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3034 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3034.html |