IA HF2187 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain reporting requirements of the department of transportation. (Formerly HSB 518.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain reporting requirements of the department of transportation. (Formerly HSB 518.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 926. |
2024-04-19 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 925. |
2024-03-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 611. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 572. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 568. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2144. S.J. 568. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 2144. S.J. 369. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 369. |
2024-02-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 360. |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays 0. H.J. 358. |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 147. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB518 (Related) 2024-01-29 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2187.
SSB3034 (Related) 2024-01-29 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2144.
SF2144 (Similar To) 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 569.
SSB3034 (Related) 2024-01-29 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2144.
SF2144 (Similar To) 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 569.