IA SSB3022 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2155
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning public investment maturity limitations relating to the operating funds of political subdivisions.
Title
A bill for an act concerning public investment maturity limitations relating to the operating funds of political subdivisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2018 11:00AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Smith, Feenstra, and Danielson. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF2155 (Replaced by) 2018-04-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 945.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3022 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3022.html |