IA SF2155 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 945.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 945.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning public investment maturity limitations relating to the operating funds of political subdivisions. (Formerly SSB 3022.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act concerning public investment maturity limitations relating to the operating funds of political subdivisions. (Formerly SSB 3022.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 945. |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 945. |
2018-04-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 714. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 841. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays 0. S.J. 840. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5197. S.J. 839. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5197. S.J. 798. |
2018-03-27 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 689. |
2018-03-27 | House | Passed House, ayes 100, nays none. H.J. 686. |
2018-03-27 | House | Committee amendment H-8195 adopted. H.J. 686. |
2018-03-22 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671. |
2018-03-07 | House | Committee amendment H-8195 filed. H.J. 517. |
2018-03-07 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 516. |
2018-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-02-22 | House | Subcommittee: Bergan, Koester and Lensing. H.J. 372. |
2018-02-21 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 333. |
2018-02-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 327. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 388. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 0. S.J. 385. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 217. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 212. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3022 (Related) 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.