IA SSB3016 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF2337

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2337.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to traffic violations and enforcement, including the use of an electronic device in a voice-activated or hands-free mode while driving and the use of automated or remote systems for traffic law enforcement, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 2337.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to traffic violations and enforcement, including the use of an electronic device in a voice-activated or hands-free mode while driving and the use of automated or remote systems for traffic law enforcement, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 2337.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-13SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2337.
2024-01-30SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2024-01-26SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2024 10:00AM Senate Lounge.
2024-01-10SenateSubcommittee: Zaun, Bisignano, and Garrett.
2024-01-10SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2024-01-10SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HSB668 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2024 2:30PM RM 19 (Cancelled).
SF2337 (Replaced by) 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback