IA SF2337 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to traffic violations and enforcement, including the use of an electronic device in a voice-activated or hands-free mode while driving and the use of automated or remote systems for traffic law enforcement, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3016.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to traffic violations and enforcement, including the use of an electronic device in a voice-activated or hands-free mode while driving and the use of automated or remote systems for traffic law enforcement, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3016.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 289. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 285. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3016 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2337.
HSB668 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2024 2:30PM RM 19 (Cancelled).
HSB668 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2024 2:30PM RM 19 (Cancelled).