IA SSB3015 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2129
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2303
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2303
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the inheritance tax by modifying the requirements to qualify for a deferment of tax payment under certain circumstances in the case of estates with a deferred estate or remainder interest, and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the inheritance tax by modifying the requirements to qualify for a deferment of tax payment under certain circumstances in the case of estates with a deferred estate or remainder interest, and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 4:00PM RM 315 |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Schultz, and Bisignano. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HF2129 (Replaced by) 2018-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 799.
SF2303 (Replaced by) 2018-05-04 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1059.
HSB505 (Related) 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2303 (Replaced by) 2018-05-04 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1059.
HSB505 (Related) 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3015 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3015.html |