IA SSB3011 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2268
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2198
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2198
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2198.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2198.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to specified fees and notice provisions in connection with designated consumer lending provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to specified fees and notice provisions in connection with designated consumer lending provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2198. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2020 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, Bisignano, and Breitbach. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB514 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 201.
HF2268 (Replaced by) 2020-03-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 442.
SF2198 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 615.
HF2268 (Replaced by) 2020-03-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 442.
SF2198 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 615.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3011 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3011.html |