IA SF2198 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 615.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 615.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to notice provisions in connection with designated consumer lending provisions. (Formerly SSB 3011.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to notice provisions in connection with designated consumer lending provisions. (Formerly SSB 3011.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 615. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 609. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 499. |
2020-03-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 427. |
2020-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 566. |
2020-03-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 532. |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed House, yeas 98, nays none. H.J. 425. |
2020-03-03 | House | Substituted for HF 2268. H.J. 425. |
2020-02-26 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 383. |
2020-02-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 371. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 420. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 419. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 262. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 255. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3011 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2198.
HSB514 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 201.
HF2268 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 442.
HSB514 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 201.
HF2268 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 442.