IA SSB1173 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF377
Note: Legislation replaced by HF579
Note: Legislation replaced by HF579
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2017 12:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge (Cancelled)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2017 12:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge (Cancelled)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to criminal sentencing by modifying criminal penalties for cocaine base, making inapplicable certain provisions relating to mandatory sentences, mandatory minimum sentences, limitations on parole and work release, and limitations on earned time.
Title
A bill for an act relating to criminal sentencing by modifying criminal penalties for cocaine base, making inapplicable certain provisions relating to mandatory sentences, mandatory minimum sentences, limitations on parole and work release, and limitations on earned time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2017 12:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge (Cancelled) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Dawson, and Petersen. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HF377 (Replaced by) 2017-03-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 695.
HF579 (Replaced by) 2017-04-07 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930.
HF579 (Replaced by) 2017-04-07 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1173 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1173.html |