IA HF579 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-07 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-07 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to criminal sentencing by modifying criminal penalties for cocaine base and attempted murder, making inapplicable certain provisions relating to mandatory sentences, mandatory minimum sentences, limitations on parole and work release, and limitations on earned time, and modifying the reconsideration of certain felons’ sentences. (Formerly HF 377.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to criminal sentencing by modifying criminal penalties for cocaine base and attempted murder, making inapplicable certain provisions relating to mandatory sentences, mandatory minimum sentences, limitations on parole and work release, and limitations on earned time, and modifying the reconsideration of certain felons’ sentences. (Formerly HF 377.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Amendment S-3272 filed. S.J. 854. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 854. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Petersen, and Schneider. S.J. 720. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 686. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 686. |
2017-03-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 695. |
2017-03-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays 0. H.J. 686. |
2017-03-15 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 567. |
Same As/Similar To
HF377 (Similar To) 2017-03-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 695.
SSB1173 (Related) 2017-03-02 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2017 12:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge (Cancelled)
SSB1173 (Related) 2017-03-02 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2017 12:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge (Cancelled)