IA SSB1151 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF486
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 486.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 486.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to credit transactions involving agricultural items, including by providing for warehouse drying or storage liens on crops and by establishing a central filing system relating to security interests in farm products, providing fees, and including applicability, contingent implementation, and effective date provisions.(See SF 486.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to credit transactions involving agricultural items, including by providing for warehouse drying or storage liens on crops and by establishing a central filing system relating to security interests in farm products, providing fees, and including applicability, contingent implementation, and effective date provisions.(See SF 486.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 486. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2021 12:30PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee: Reichman, Bisignano, and Schultz. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB130 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-1
SF486 (Replaced by) 2021-03-10 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Jochum, and Sweeney. S.J. 591.
SF486 (Replaced by) 2021-03-10 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Jochum, and Sweeney. S.J. 591.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1151 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1151.html |