IA HSB130 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF486
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-1
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-1
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to credit transactions involving agricultural items, including by providing for warehouse drying or storage liens on crops and by establishing a central filing system relating to security interests in farm products, providing fees, and including applicability, contingent implementation, and effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to credit transactions involving agricultural items, including by providing for warehouse drying or storage liens on crops and by establishing a central filing system relating to security interests in farm products, providing fees, and including applicability, contingent implementation, and effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2021 8:30AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2021-01-25 | House | Subcommittee: Sexton, Bacon and Wilburn. H.J. 196. |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 194. |
2021-01-25 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1151 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 486.
SF486 (Replaced by) 2021-03-10 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Jochum, and Sweeney. S.J. 591.
SF486 (Replaced by) 2021-03-10 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Jochum, and Sweeney. S.J. 591.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB130 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB130.html |